LA SB105 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Effective date 6/21/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for an African-American military service members monument in the Louisiana Veterans Memorial Park. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE SG EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for an African-American military service members monument in the Louisiana Veterans Memorial Park. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE SG EX See Note)

Sponsors

Sen. Gerald Boudreaux [D]Sen. Mark Abraham [R]Sen. R Allain [R]Sen. Regina Barrow [D]
Sen. Louie Bernard [R]Sen. Joseph Bouie [D]Sen. Stewart Cathey [R]Sen. Heather Cloud [R]
Sen. Patrick Connick [R]Sen. Patrick Cortez [R]Sen. Cleo Fields [D]Sen. Franklin Foil [R]
Sen. Jimmy Harris [D]Sen. Cameron Henry [R]Sen. Bob Hensgens [R]Sen. Sharon Hewitt [R]
Sen. Katrina Jackson [D]Sen. Ronnie Johns [R]Sen. Eddie Lambert [R]Sen. W. Jay Luneau [D]
Sen. Patrick McMath [R]Sen. Barry Milligan [R]Sen. Fred Mills [R]Sen. Robert Mills [R]
Sen. John Morris [R]Sen. Barrow Peacock [R]Sen. Karen Peterson [D]Sen. Rogers Pope [R]
Sen. Edward Price [D]Sen. Mike Reese [R]Sen. Gary Smith [D]Sen. Kirk Talbot [R]
Sen. Gregory Tarver [D]Sen. Rick Ward [R]Sen. Glen Womack [R]Rep. Daryl Adams [I]
Rep. Lawrence Bagley [R]Rep. Ken Brass [D]Rep. Marcus Bryant [D]Rep. Barbara Carpenter [D]
Rep. Gary Carter [D]Rep. Robert Carter [D]Rep. Wilford Carter [D]Rep. Mack Cormier [D]
Rep. Kenny Cox [D]Rep. Daryl Deshotel [R]Rep. Royce Duplessis [D]Rep. Barbara Freiberg [R]
Rep. Randal Gaines [D]Rep. Cedric Glover [D]Rep. Kyle Green [D]Rep. Lance Harris [R]
Rep. Dodie Horton [R]Rep. Jason Hughes [D]Rep. Edward James [D]Rep. Patrick Jefferson [D]
Rep. Samuel Jenkins [D]Rep. Travis Johnson [D]Rep. Frederick Jones [D]Rep. Edmond Jordan [D]
Rep. Jeremy LaCombe [D]Rep. Ed Larvadain [D]Rep. Rodney Lyons [D]Rep. Denise Marcelle [D]
Rep. Dustin Miller [D]Rep. Pat Moore [D]Rep. Candace Newell [D]Rep. Charles Owen [R]
Rep. Vincent Pierre [D]Rep. Thomas Pressly [R]Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R]Rep. Larry Selders [D]
Rep. Francis Thompson [D]Rep. Matthew Willard [D]

Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 105 CONCUR (#637) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Vote on SB 105 FINAL PASSAGE (#798) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 105 CO-AUTHORS (#296) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 105 FINAL PASSAGE (#295) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-21SenateEffective date 6/21/2021.
2021-06-21SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 432.
2021-06-06SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2021.
2021-06-03HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-02SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-01SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
2021-05-27SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2021-05-27HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 102, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-26HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/27/2021.
2021-05-20HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-19HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2021-05-18HouseReported with amendments (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2021-05-11HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2021-05-10SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-06SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-05SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2021-04-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2021-03-30SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=SB105&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1208864
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221148
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223012
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230630
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235887
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221716
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225324
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225665
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1208866
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1213109
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221868
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222283
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223066
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223198
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229461
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230930
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235995
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222778
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222780
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229255
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230457

Bill Comments

feedback