LA SB104 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Enrolled on June 8 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 8 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for health insurance coverage of genetic testing for diseases and other medical conditions. (8/1/23) (EG2 INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides for health insurance coverage of genetic testing for diseases and other medical conditions. (8/1/23) (EG2 INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Jeremy Stine [R] | Sen. Royce Duplessis [D] | Sen. Michael Fesi [R] | Sen. Katrina Jackson [D] |
Sen. Robert Mills [R] | Sen. Barrow Peacock [R] | Sen. Gary Smith [D] | Sen. Kirk Talbot [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 104 CONCUR (#937) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - House - House Vote on SB 104 FINAL PASSAGE (#1006) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 104 FINAL PASSAGE (#236) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - House - House Vote on SB 104 FINAL PASSAGE (#1006) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 104 FINAL PASSAGE (#236) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2023-06-05 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2023-06-05 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2023-06-05 | House | Rules suspended. |
2023-06-05 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-06-04 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2023-06-02 | House | Reported with amendments (18-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2023-06-01 | House | Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2023-05-31 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2023-05-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2023-05-08 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |