LA SB102 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to disposition of children after adjudication of certain felony-grade delinquent acts. (8/1/18) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to disposition of children after adjudication of certain felony-grade delinquent acts. (8/1/18) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 102 CONCUR (#1336) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on SB 102 FINAL PASSAGE (#1202) (Y: 56 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House Vote on SB 102 FINAL PASSAGE (#872) (Y: 37 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 102 FINAL PASSAGE (#231) (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23SenateEffective date 8/1/2018.
2018-05-23SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 467.
2018-05-18SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
2018-05-18HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-18SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-18SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and `0 nays.
2018-05-17SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2018-05-16HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 56, nays 30. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-16HouseCalled from the calendar.
2018-05-14HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/16/18.
2018-05-14HouseNotice given.
2018-05-14HouseRead by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
2018-05-14HouseRules suspended.
2018-05-14HouseMotion to reconsider pending.
2018-05-14HouseRules suspended.
2018-05-09HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 37, nays 48. Failed to pass.
2018-05-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/09/18.
2018-04-27HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-26HouseReported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
2018-04-25HouseReported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-04HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2018-04-03HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2018-04-03SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 4 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-03-21SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-03-20SenateReported favorably.
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2018-02-26SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=SB102&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1067770
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1076814
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099308
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1102050
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082154
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088666
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090252
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090364
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093269
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098363
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1067778
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1076479
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077874
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077977
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090260
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099700
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1101677
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082495
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095090
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098342
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099187

Bill Comments

feedback