LA SB102 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Effective date 6/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Effective date 6/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates and provides for Louisiana Educational Workforce Training Fund to provide opportunities for educational training in the Louisiana Community and Technical College System. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)
Title
Creates and provides for Louisiana Educational Workforce Training Fund to provide opportunities for educational training in the Louisiana Community and Technical College System. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 102 CONCUR (#873) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Vote on SB 102 FINAL PASSAGE (#737) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 102 FINAL PASSAGE (#164) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Vote on SB 102 FINAL PASSAGE (#737) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 102 FINAL PASSAGE (#164) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-23 | Senate | Effective date 6/23/2017. |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 379. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2017-06-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2017-06-05 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/17. |
2017-06-01 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-31 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2017-05-30 | House | Reported favorably (16-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-18 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2017-05-17 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2017-05-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2017-05-02 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance. |