LA SB102 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Effective date 8/1/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to firearm-free zones. (8/1/16)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to firearm-free zones. (8/1/16)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-24 - House - House Vote on SB 102 FINAL PASSAGE (#1005) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 102 FINAL PASSAGE (#278) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-02SenateEffective date 8/1/2016.
2016-06-02SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 337.
2016-05-26SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2016-05-25HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2016-05-25SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2016-05-24SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2016-05-24HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2016-05-19HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2016.
2016-05-13HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2016-05-12HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2016-05-11HouseReported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2016-04-18HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2016-04-14HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2016-04-14SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2016-04-13SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2016-04-12SenateReported favorably.
2016-03-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2016-03-01SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback