LA SB100 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Effective date 7/1/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Effective date 7/1/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the requirement of the division of administration to produce a non-discretionary adjusted standstill budget. (7/1/17) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides for the requirement of the division of administration to produce a non-discretionary adjusted standstill budget. (7/1/17) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 100 CONCUR (#872) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Vote on SB 100 FINAL PASSAGE (#735) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 100 FINAL PASSAGE (#277) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Vote on SB 100 FINAL PASSAGE (#735) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 100 FINAL PASSAGE (#277) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2017. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 402. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2017-06-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2017-06-05 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/17. |
2017-06-01 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-31 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2017-05-30 | House | Reported with amendments (18-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-15 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2017-05-11 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance. |