LA SB10 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 45-18-1)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Effective date 7/13/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 45-18-1)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Effective date 7/13/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to rural broadband high-speed internet access.
Title
Provides relative to rural broadband high-speed internet access.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 10 CONCUR (#114) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Vote on SB 10 FINAL PASSAGE (#107) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 10 FINAL PASSAGE (#38) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Vote on SB 10 FINAL PASSAGE (#107) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 10 FINAL PASSAGE (#38) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | Senate | Effective date 7/13/2020. |
2020-07-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 16. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2020-06-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2020-06-24 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 102, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-06-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/24/20. |
2020-06-23 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-06-23 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-06-23 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2020-06-22 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-06-15 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2020-06-14 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |