LA SB1 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 88-53-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - Effective date 8/1/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 88-53-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - Effective date 8/1/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To designate a portion of LA Highway 14 in Calcasieu Parish as the "Louisiana State Trooper Steven Vincent Memorial Highway". (8/1/16)
Title
To designate a portion of LA Highway 14 in Calcasieu Parish as the "Louisiana State Trooper Steven Vincent Memorial Highway". (8/1/16)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - House - House Vote on SB 1 FINAL PASSAGE (#387) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 1 FINAL PASSAGE (#53) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 1 FINAL PASSAGE (#53) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2016. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 1. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2016-04-20 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2016-04-19 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-04-14 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/19/2016. |
2016-04-14 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-04-13 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2016-04-12 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-03-30 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2016-03-29 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |