LA HR8 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requests an investigation of out-of-state retailers at which the greatest amounts of Louisiana-issued SNAP benefits are expended for purposes of fraud detection and prevention

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requests an investigation of out-of-state retailers at which the greatest amounts of Louisiana-issued SNAP benefits are expended for purposes of fraud detection and prevention

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-04 - House - House Vote on HR 8 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#182) (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-05HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-05-04HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 70, nays 30. The resolution was adopted.
2021-04-29HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2021.
2021-04-29HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-28HouseReported favorably (12-0).
2021-04-13HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2021-04-12HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback