LA HR8 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Changes provisions of the Rules relative to the vouchered allotment for members of the House of Representatives set by the House Executive Committee

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes provisions of the Rules relative to the vouchered allotment for members of the House of Representatives set by the House Executive Committee

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-15 - House - House Vote on HR 8 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#31) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-17HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2020-06-16HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-06-15HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0. The resolution was adopted.
2020-06-15HouseRules suspended, called out of its regular order.
2020-06-11HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/16/20.
2020-06-11HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-06-10HouseReported favorably (11-0-1).
2020-06-05HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback