LA HR8 | 2016 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requests the secretary of state to study same-day voter registration for in-person early voting

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requests the secretary of state to study same-day voter registration for in-person early voting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-23 - House - House Vote on HR 8 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#49) (Y: 70 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-23HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2016-06-23HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2016-06-23HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 70, nays 14. The resolution was adopted.
2016-06-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/23/2016.
2016-06-22HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2016-06-21HouseReported favorably (9-0).
2016-06-19HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback