LA HR54 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the state superintendent to request school and district performance score waivers from the U.S. Department of Education for the 2020-2021 school year
Title
Urges the state superintendent to request school and district performance score waivers from the U.S. Department of Education for the 2020-2021 school year
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - House - House Vote on HR 54 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#183) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2021-05-05 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-05-04 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2021-05-04 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-03 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |