LA HR46 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes and directs the executive branch agencies that submit statutorily required reports to the House Committee on Health and Welfare to continue to submit such reports as required by law
Title
Authorizes and directs the executive branch agencies that submit statutorily required reports to the House Committee on Health and Welfare to continue to submit such reports as required by law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-01 - House - House Vote on HR 46 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#795) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2020-06-01 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-06-01 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2020-06-01 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2020-06-01 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2020-06-01 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2020-06-01 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2020-05-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/20. |
2020-05-28 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-27 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2020-05-20 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |