LA HR211 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes and celebrates the fiftieth anniversary of the enactment of Title IX and celebrates its history and impact
Title
Recognizes and celebrates the fiftieth anniversary of the enactment of Title IX and celebrates its history and impact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-06 - House - House Vote on HR 211 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1656) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2022-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-06 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2022-06-06 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-06-06 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/2022. |
2022-06-01 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-31 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |