LA HR21 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the state retirement systems to provide information to the legislature regarding permanent benefit increases for retirees.
Title
Requests the state retirement systems to provide information to the legislature regarding permanent benefit increases for retirees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-18 - House - House Vote on HR 21 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#174) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2020-05-19 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-18 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2020-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/20. |
2020-05-13 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-07 | House | Reported favorably (8-0). |
2020-05-04 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2020-03-31 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |