LA HR2 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides certain requirements for passage of certain resolutions
Title
Provides certain requirements for passage of certain resolutions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-29 - House - House Vote on HR 2 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#632) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-30 | House | Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2013-05-29 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2013-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/29/2013. |
2013-05-22 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2013-05-21 | House | Reported favorably (7-0). |
2013-04-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |