LA HR184 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Department of Economic Development to study and report on commercial activities by state-owned companies or organizations in and subsidized by certain foreign governments and requests the state treasurer to certify that no public funds are used to support commercial activities in foreign governments
Title
Requests the Department of Economic Development to study and report on commercial activities by state-owned companies or organizations in and subsidized by certain foreign governments and requests the state treasurer to certify that no public funds are used to support commercial activities in foreign governments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-11 - House - House Vote on HR 184 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#972) (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2018-05-14 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-11 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 78, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2018-05-08 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/18. |
2018-05-08 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |