LA HR164 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-04 - Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-04 - Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs DHH to submit a report on the status of Act No. 299 of the 2011 R.S.
Title
Directs DHH to submit a report on the status of Act No. 299 of the 2011 R.S.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-03 - House - House Vote on HR 164, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1515) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-04 | Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |
2012-06-03 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. | |
2012-06-01 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/3/2012. | |
2012-06-01 | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. | |
2012-05-31 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |