LA HR148 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a task force on the policies of the Recreation and Park Commission for the Parish of East Baton Rouge
Title
Creates a task force on the policies of the Recreation and Park Commission for the Parish of East Baton Rouge
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on HR 148 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1145) (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2018-05-17 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-16 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 78, nays 1. The resolution was adopted. |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/18. |
2018-05-09 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-08 | House | Reported with amendments (8-0). |
2018-05-07 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-05-03 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0) To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-04-30 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2018-04-27 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |