LA HR145 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates August 31, 2024, as Terry Slack Day in Louisiana
Title
Designates August 31, 2024, as Terry Slack Day in Louisiana
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2024-04-24 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-04-23 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted. |