LA HR132 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for a study of automatic voter registration

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for a study of automatic voter registration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-10 - House of Representatives - House Vote on HR 132 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1040) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-15HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2015-06-10HouseEnrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2015-06-10HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0. The resolution was adopted.
2015-06-09HouseScheduled for floor debate on 6/10/2015.
2015-06-03HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2015-06-02HouseReported favorably (11-0).
2015-06-01HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback