LA HR13 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to House Legislative Services employees and duties of the Clerk of the House
Title
Provides relative to House Legislative Services employees and duties of the Clerk of the House
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HR 13 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#742) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2020-06-01 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-31 | House | Read by title, amended, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2020-05-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/20. |
2020-05-21 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-20 | House | Reported favorably (13-0-1). |
2020-03-16 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |