LA HR113 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests the Department of Agriculture and Forestry, in collaboration with the Louisiana State University Agricultural Center and Southern University Agricultural Research and Extension Center, to study the feasibility of promoting the growth, production, and use of organic produce in this state
Title
Urges and requests the Department of Agriculture and Forestry, in collaboration with the Louisiana State University Agricultural Center and Southern University Agricultural Research and Extension Center, to study the feasibility of promoting the growth, production, and use of organic produce in this state
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-02 - House - House Vote on HR 113 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#635) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2017-06-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-02 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2017-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/17. |
2017-05-25 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-24 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). |
2017-05-15 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2017-05-11 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |