LA HR102 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-20 - Scheduled for floor debate on 6/21/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-20 - Scheduled for floor debate on 6/21/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the House Executive Committee to consider allowing open access to the wireless Internet capabilities in House-controlled areas of the State Capitol (OR NO IMPACT GF EX See Note)
Title
Requests the House Executive Committee to consider allowing open access to the wireless Internet capabilities in House-controlled areas of the State Capitol (OR NO IMPACT GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-20 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/21/2010. | |
2010-06-16 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | |
2010-06-15 | Reported with amendments (17-0). | |
2010-05-20 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-05-19 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |