LA HCSR4 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-16 - Returned to house of origin and approved on 6/16/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-16 - Returned to house of origin and approved on 6/16/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requests a study regarding issues related to voting by incarcerated persons
Title
Requests a study regarding issues related to voting by incarcerated persons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-16 | Returned to house of origin and approved on 6/16/2011. | |
2011-06-16 | Approved on 6/16/11. | |
2011-06-08 | Study request list distributed to the members on 6/8/11. | |
2011-06-07 | Request study by the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | |
2011-06-07 | Received by the Senate Office on 6/7/11. | |
2011-06-07 | Sent to the Senate. | |
2011-06-02 | Study request list distributed to members on 6/2/2011. | |
2011-05-23 | Received on 5/23/2011. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=11RS&billid=HCSR4 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=749408 |