LA HCR99 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Commends Mr. William E. "Bill" Crawford on his retirement from the Louisiana State Law Institute

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commends Mr. William E. "Bill" Crawford on his retirement from the Louisiana State Law Institute

Sponsors

Rep. Raymond Garofalo [R]Rep. Mark Abraham [R]Rep. Neil Abramson [D]Rep. Daryl Adams [I]
Rep. Beryl Amedee [R]Rep. John Anders [D]Rep. James Armes [D]Rep. Tony Bacala [R]
Rep. Lawrence Bagley [R]Rep. John Bagneris [D]Rep. Taylor Barras [R]Rep. John Berthelot [R]
Rep. Robert Billiot [D]Rep. Stuart Bishop [R]Rep. Joseph Bouie [D]Rep. Ryan Bourriaque [R]
Rep. Ken Brass [D]Rep. Chad Brown [D]Rep. Terry Brown [I]Rep. Thomas Carmody [R]
Rep. Barbara Carpenter [D]Rep. Gary Carter [D]Rep. Robert Carter [D]Rep. Stephen Carter [R]
Rep. Charles Chaney [R]Rep. Patrick Connick [R]Rep. Jean-paul Coussan [R]Rep. Kenny Cox [D]
Rep. Raymond Crews [R]Rep. Paula Davis [R]Rep. Phillip DeVillier [R]Rep. Mary DuBuisson [R]
Rep. Royce Duplessis [D]Rep. Stephen Dwight [R]Rep. Rick Edmonds [R]Rep. Julie Emerson [R]
Rep. Reid Falconer [R]Rep. Franklin Foil [R]Rep. A.B. Franklin [D]Rep. Randal Gaines [D]
Rep. Jerry Gisclair [D]Rep. Cedric Glover [D]Rep. John Guinn [R]Rep. Jimmy Harris [D]
Rep. Lance Harris [R]Rep. Cameron Henry [R]Rep. Stephanie Hilferty [R]Rep. Dorothy Hill [D]
Rep. Valarie Hodges [R]Rep. Frank Hoffmann [R]Rep. Paul Hollis [R]Rep. Dodie Horton [R]
Rep. Frank Howard [R]Rep. Mike Huval [R]Rep. Barry Ivey [R]Rep. Katrina Jackson [D]
Rep. Edward James [D]Rep. Patrick Jefferson [D]Rep. Samuel Jenkins [D]Rep. Mike Johnson [R]
Rep. Robert Johnson [D]Rep. Sam Jones [D]Rep. Edmond Jordan [D]Rep. Jeremy LaCombe [D]
Rep. Nancy Landry [R]Rep. Terry Landry [D]Rep. Ed Larvadain [D]Rep. Bernard LeBas [D]
Rep. Walt Leger [D]Rep. Christopher Leopold [R]Rep. Rodney Lyons [D]Rep. Sherman Mack [R]
Rep. Tanner Magee [R]Rep. Denise Marcelle [D]Rep. Joseph Marino [I]Rep. Jack McFarland [R]
Rep. Wayne McMahen [R]Rep. Blake Miguez [R]Rep. Dustin Miller [D]Rep. Gregory Miller [R]
Rep. Pat Moore [D]Rep. John Morris [R]Rep. James Morris [R]Rep. Stuart Moss [R]
Rep. Nicholas Muscarello [R]Rep. Barbara Norton [D]Rep. Kevin Pearson [R]Rep. Vincent Pierre [D]
Rep. Rogers Pope [R]Rep. Stephen Pugh [R]Rep. Steve Pylant [R]Rep. Jerome Richard [I]
Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R]Rep. Alan Seabaugh [R]Rep. Scott Simon [R]Rep. Patricia Smith [D]
Rep. Joseph Stagni [D]Rep. John Stefanski [R]Rep. Julie Stokes [R]Rep. Kirk Talbot [R]
Rep. Polly Thomas [R]Rep. Christopher Turner [R]Rep. Malinda White [D]Rep. Mark Wright [R]
Rep. Jerome Zeringue [R]Sen. John Alario [R]Sen. R Allain [R]Sen. Conrad Appel [R]
Sen. Regina Barrow [D]Sen. Wesley Bishop [D]Sen. Gerald Boudreaux [D]Sen. Troy Carter [D]
Sen. Norby Chabert [R]Sen. Dan Claitor [R]Sen. Yvonne Dorsey-Colomb [D]Sen. Patrick Cortez [R]
Sen. Jack Donahue [R]Sen. Dale Erdey [R]Sen. James Fannin [R]Sen. Ryan Gatti [R]
Sen. Bob Hensgens [R]Sen. Sharon Hewitt [R]Sen. Ronnie Johns [R]Sen. Eric LaFleur [D]
Sen. Eddie Lambert [R]Sen. Gerald Long [R]Sen. W. Jay Luneau [D]Sen. Daniel Martiny [R]
Sen. Fred Mills [R]Sen. Beth Mizell [R]Sen. Jean-Paul Morrell [D]Sen. Dan Morrish [R]
Sen. Barrow Peacock [R]Sen. Karen Peterson [D]Sen. Edward Price [D]Sen. Neil Riser [R]
Sen. Gary Smith [D]Sen. John Smith [R]Sen. Gregory Tarver [D]Sen. Francis Thompson [D]
Sen. Michael Walsworth [R]Sen. Rick Ward [D]Sen. Mack White [R]

Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 99 CO-AUTHORS (#948) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 99 ADOPT (#947) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-07HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2019-06-05SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-05HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-04HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2019-06-04SenateRead by title and concurred in by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
2019-06-04SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2019-05-27SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2019-05-23SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-22HouseRead by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback