LA HCR97 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests the Wildlife and Fisheries Commission to study creel limits on freshwater fish in the state
Title
Urges and requests the Wildlife and Fisheries Commission to study creel limits on freshwater fish in the state
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 97, ADOPT (#369) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-14 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |
2011-06-13 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-06 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-02 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2011-06-02 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |
2011-06-02 | Rules suspended | |
2011-05-31 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | |
2011-05-16 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. | |
2011-05-16 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |