LA HCR96 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the Lake Providence Watershed Council
Title
Extends the Lake Providence Watershed Council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 96 ADOPT (#687) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HCR 96 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#744) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HCR 96 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#744) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-06-01 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-06-01 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2020-05-31 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 95, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-31 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-05-31 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-31 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2020-05-28 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |