LA HCR93 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the governor to ensure that individual liberty and rights are protected as the state administers contact tracing
Title
Requests the governor to ensure that individual liberty and rights are protected as the state administers contact tracing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-01 - House - House Vote on HCR 93 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#759) (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2020-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 93 ADOPT (#666) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HCR 93 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#369) (Y: 59 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HCR 93 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#369) (Y: 58 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 93 ADOPT (#666) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HCR 93 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#369) (Y: 59 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HCR 93 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#369) (Y: 58 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-06-01 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-06-01 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 79, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2020-05-31 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/01/20. |
2020-05-31 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2020-05-31 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2020-05-31 | Senate | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2020-05-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2020-05-22 | House | Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 59, nays 31. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20. |
2020-05-21 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-20 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2020-05-18 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |