LA HCR93 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-15 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-15 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the Arcadia High School boys basketball team upon reaching the 2010 Top 28 Tournament semifinals
Title
Commends the Arcadia High School boys basketball team upon reaching the 2010 Top 28 Tournament semifinals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 93, ADOPT (#91) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-15 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |
2010-04-13 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-04-12 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-04-08 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-04-08 | Received in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |
2010-04-07 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |