LA HCR90 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-15 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-15 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Calob Leindecker upon receiving the 2009 High School Football Rudy Award and the 2009 LHSAA/LSWA Tommy Henry Courage Award
Title
Commends Calob Leindecker upon receiving the 2009 High School Football Rudy Award and the 2009 LHSAA/LSWA Tommy Henry Courage Award
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 90, ADJOURN (#84) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-15 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |
2010-04-13 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-04-08 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-04-07 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-04-07 | Received in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |
2010-04-07 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |