LA HCR88 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests the La. Department of Health to utilize increased collections from pharmacy rebates to increase rates for primary care providers in the Medicaid program
Title
Urges and requests the La. Department of Health to utilize increased collections from pharmacy rebates to increase rates for primary care providers in the Medicaid program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-06 - House - House Vote on HCR 88 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1673) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 88 ADOPT (#1418) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - House - House Vote on HCR 88 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1233) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 88 CONCUR (#895) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House Vote on HCR 88 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#768) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 88 ADOPT (#1418) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - House - House Vote on HCR 88 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1233) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 88 CONCUR (#895) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House Vote on HCR 88 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#768) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2022-06-06 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2022-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. |
2022-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/2022. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2022-06-03 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2022-06-02 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Fred Mills, Cathey, and Hensgens. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2022-06-02 | House | House conferees appointed: Echols, Bagley, and Butler. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2022-05-31 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2022-05-26 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/2022. |
2022-05-26 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-11 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 94, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2022. |
2022-05-04 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-03 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2022-04-26 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-04-25 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |