LA HCR88 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to a study of the issue of courts raising prescription sua sponte

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to a study of the issue of courts raising prescription sua sponte

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 88 ADOPT (#1325) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on HCR 88 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1257) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2018-05-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
2018-05-18HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-18HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2018-05-18SenateRead by title and concurred in by a vote of 22 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
2018-05-17SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-05-17HouseRead by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 88, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-17HouseRules suspended, called out of its regular order.
2018-05-16HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18.
2018-05-15HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-05-14HouseReported favorably (6-0).
2018-05-07HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HCR88&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093511
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096283
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098543
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099303
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097833
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093512
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096559
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098806
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1105581
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098478
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099104

Bill Comments

feedback