LA HCR88 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-12 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-12 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Task Force on Telehealth Access
Title
Creates the Task Force on Telehealth Access
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Simon [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-02 - House - House Vote on HCR 88 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1611) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 88 ADOPT (#1625) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - House - House Vote on HCR 88 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#705) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 88 ADOPT (#1625) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - House - House Vote on HCR 88 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#705) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-12 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/4/2014. |
2014-06-04 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-06-02 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2014-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2014. |
2014-05-30 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2014. |
2014-05-30 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2014-05-05 | House | Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 95, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2014-04-30 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2014. |
2014-04-30 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-04-29 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2014-04-21 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2014-04-16 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |