LA HCR82 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Louisiana Department of Transportation and Development to study water drainage issues in Livingston Parish as a result of Interstate 12 median walls
Title
Directs the Louisiana Department of Transportation and Development to study water drainage issues in Livingston Parish as a result of Interstate 12 median walls
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - House Vote on HCR 82 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1176) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 82 CONCUR (#1006) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Vote on HCR 82 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#694) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 82 CONCUR (#1006) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Vote on HCR 82 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#694) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-06-09 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-09 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2021-06-08 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/09/2021. |
2021-06-08 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-06-06 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-26 | House | Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 94, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2021. |
2021-05-13 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-12 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2021-05-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2021-05-10 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |