LA HCR82 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the Louisiana Justice Reinvestment Task Force to develop certain sentencing and corrections policy recommendations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the Louisiana Justice Reinvestment Task Force to develop certain sentencing and corrections policy recommendations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 82 ADOPT (#711) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - House - House Vote on HCR 82 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#592) (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-15HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2015-06-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2015-06-07HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2015-06-04HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2015-06-03SenateRead by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 2 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
2015-06-03SenateRules suspended.
2015-06-02SenateReported favorably.
2015-06-01SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2015-06-01HouseRead by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 81, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
2015-05-28HouseScheduled for floor debate on 6/01/2015.
2015-05-21HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2015-05-20HouseReported favorably (7-0).
2015-05-19HouseRead by title, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2015-05-19HouseRules suspended, called out of its regular order.
2015-05-14HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2015-05-13HouseReported with amendments (10-0).
2015-04-28HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2015-04-27HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback