LA HCR80 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-18 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-18 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the office of public health to conduct a comprehensive assessment of this state's response to the COVID-19 pandemic
Title
Directs the office of public health to conduct a comprehensive assessment of this state's response to the COVID-19 pandemic
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - House - House Vote on HCR 80 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#852) (Y: 63 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-16 | House | Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 63, nays 31. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-16 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-16 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2022. |
2022-05-05 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-04 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2022-04-25 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-04-21 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |