LA HCR80 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates May 11, 2021, as Hospital Day at the state capitol
Title
Designates May 11, 2021, as Hospital Day at the state capitol
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 80 CONCUR (#312) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-05-17 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-05-11 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-10 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |