LA HCR75 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-10-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-10-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Workforce Investment Council and Occupational Forecasting Conference to immediately work with private sector experts to assess short-term and long-term workforce implications and opportunities resulting from COVID-19
Title
Requests the Workforce Investment Council and Occupational Forecasting Conference to immediately work with private sector experts to assess short-term and long-term workforce implications and opportunities resulting from COVID-19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 75 ADOPT (#664) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - House Vote on HCR 75 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#208) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - House Vote on HCR 75 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#208) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-06-01 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-31 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2020-05-31 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2020-05-20 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 100, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/20. |
2020-05-18 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-15 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2020-05-07 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |