LA HCR75 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes May 1, 2018, as Acadiana Day at the state capitol
Title
Recognizes May 1, 2018, as Acadiana Day at the state capitol
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Huval [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 75 ADOPT (#633) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-27 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |