LA HCR75 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Louisiana Department of Health take all necessary steps to bring attention to the need to eliminate pain as the fifth vital sign and a determinant of quality patient care
Title
Requests the Louisiana Department of Health take all necessary steps to bring attention to the need to eliminate pain as the fifth vital sign and a determinant of quality patient care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 75 ADOPT (#780) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 75 ADOPT (#604) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - House Vote on HCR 75 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#580) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 75 ADOPT (#604) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - House Vote on HCR 75 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#580) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-04 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-04 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2017-06-01 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 98, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/17. |
2017-05-24 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-23 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2017-05-16 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2017-05-15 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |