LA HCR74 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests that CARES Act funding be made available to the state for testing and be distributed to healthcare systems (EN SEE FISC NOTE FF EX See Note)
Title
Requests that CARES Act funding be made available to the state for testing and be distributed to healthcare systems (EN SEE FISC NOTE FF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 74 ADOPT (#331) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Vote on HCR 74 HCR 74 BY MR. SPEAKER (#198) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Vote on HCR 74 HCR 74 BY MR. SPEAKER (#198) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-05-27 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-27 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2020-05-25 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2020-05-18 | House | Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 96, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/20. |
2020-05-15 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-13 | House | Reported with amendments (17-0). |
2020-05-07 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |