LA HCR74 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requests a study regarding the feasibility of merging the Board of Barber Examiners and the Louisiana State Board of Cosmetology
Title
Requests a study regarding the feasibility of merging the Board of Barber Examiners and the Louisiana State Board of Cosmetology
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-05-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/18. |
2018-05-02 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-01 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2018-04-30 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2018-04-27 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |