LA HCR74 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the West Monroe High School football team upon winning the 2009 Class 5A State Championship
Title
Commends the West Monroe High School football team upon winning the 2009 Class 5A State Championship
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 74, ADOPT (#57) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |
2010-04-08 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-04-07 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-04-06 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-04-06 | Received in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |
2010-03-31 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |