LA HCR73 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Urges and requests the collaboration of certain departments with the Louisiana Waterfowl Working Group to improve waterfowl habitats on private, state, and federally owned lands

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urges and requests the collaboration of certain departments with the Louisiana Waterfowl Working Group to improve waterfowl habitats on private, state, and federally owned lands

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 73 CONCUR (#682) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Vote on HCR 73 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#632) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-09HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2021-06-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-07HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-03HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2021-06-02SenateRead by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
2021-06-01SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2021-05-25SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
2021-05-24SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-24HouseRead by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 99, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2021.
2021-05-13HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-12HouseReported with amendments (14-0).
2021-05-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2021-05-06HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback