LA HCR73 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 40-4-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 40-4-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests an update from the Louisiana Department of Health and the division of administration on efforts to establish an application or system to track the incidence and spread of COVID-19
Title
Requests an update from the Louisiana Department of Health and the division of administration on efforts to establish an application or system to track the incidence and spread of COVID-19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 73 ADOPT (#695) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Vote on HCR 73 HCR 73 BY MR. SPEAKER (#196) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Vote on HCR 73 AMENDMENT # 2206 BY HARRIS (#195) (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Vote on HCR 73 HCR 73 BY MR. SPEAKER (#196) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Vote on HCR 73 AMENDMENT # 2206 BY HARRIS (#195) (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-06-01 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-06-01 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2020-05-18 | House | Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 96, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/20. |
2020-05-15 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-13 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2020-05-07 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |