LA HCR73 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests a study concerning the benefits and costs of online delivery of certain training required for medication attendants
Title
Requests a study concerning the benefits and costs of online delivery of certain training required for medication attendants
Sponsors
Rep. James Armes [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 73 ADOPT (#706) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Vote on HCR 73 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#484) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Vote on HCR 73 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#484) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-03 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-22 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 90, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19. |
2019-05-14 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-14 | House | Rules suspended. |
2019-05-13 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |