LA HCR73 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Institute on Public Health and Justice to study the issue of raising the age of juvenile jurisdiction to include seventeen-year olds
Title
Requests the Institute on Public Health and Justice to study the issue of raising the age of juvenile jurisdiction to include seventeen-year olds
Sponsors
Rep. Walt Leger [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 73 ADOPT (#330) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Vote on HCR 73 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#318) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Vote on HCR 73 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#318) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-05-18 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-05-14 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 30 yeas and 2 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-05-13 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 96, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/13/2015. |
2015-05-07 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2015-04-27 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2015-04-22 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |