LA HCR73 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-21 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-21 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends CVS and local independent community pharmacies for their efforts towards reducing chronic illness associated with tobacco use
Title
Commends CVS and local independent community pharmacies for their efforts towards reducing chronic illness associated with tobacco use
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 73 ADOPT (#382) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-21 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 4/16/2014. |
2014-04-16 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-04-15 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2014-04-10 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |