LA HCR71 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes April 17, 2024, as St. Charles Parish Day at the state capitol
Title
Recognizes April 17, 2024, as St. Charles Parish Day at the state capitol
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 71 CONCUR (#324) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-04-18 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-04-17 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2024-04-17 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |